Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 784 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2899 Week
» 25405 Month
» 328595 Year
» 1550160 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79247 m/e 01/1945
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) 3193 m/e 03/1947
British Railways (1st BR) 63193 w/e 15/05/1948
British Railways 90514 m/e 08/1950

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2308
Works Number 5190
To Service During 01/1945
Withdrawal w/e Sun 23/01/1966
Scrapping During 05/1966 at Drapers (Hull)
Service Life 21 yrs , 23 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 01/1945
33B Tilbury 4w/e 10/05/1958
31B March w/e 27/06/1959
33A Plaistow w/e 10/10/1959
33B Tilbury w/e 07/11/1959
34E New England w/e 02/12/1961
36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) w/e 09/11/1963
40E Colwick w/e 19/06/1965
36C Frodingham w/e 01/01/1966
   Withdrawn w/e 23/01/1966

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 31B March 4w/e 11/07/1959
ALLOC 33A Plaistow 4w/e 31/10/1959
ALLOC 33B Tilbury 4w/e 28/11/1959
ALLOC 34E New England 5w/e 09/12/1961
ALLOC 36E Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) on 25/11/1963
ALLOC 40E Colwick 2w/e 26/06/1965
ALLOC 36C Frodingham 3w/e 01/01/1966
WDN   w/e 23/01/1966

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
01/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 79247
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5190
   
03/1947 Renumbered Renumbered to 3193    
15/05/1948 Renumbered Renumbered to 63193    
08/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 90514    
10/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
27/06/1959 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
10/10/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Plaistow (33A)    
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Tilbury (33B)    
02/12/1961 Allocation Reallocated to New England (34E)    
09/11/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Retford Thrumpton (G.C.) (36E)    
19/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Colwick (40E)    
01/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Frodingham (36C)    
23/01/1966 Withdrawn Condemned as 90514    

prev prev