Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 28 Online
» 3181 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16587 Week
» 69603 Month
» 189130 Year
» 3215983 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79253 |
m/e |
01/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3195 |
m/e |
03/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63195 |
w/e |
19/06/1948 |
British Railways |
90516 |
m/e |
12/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2308 |
Works Number |
5196 |
To Service |
During 01/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 21/11/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 10 mths , 21 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
10/12/1965 |
Doncaster MPD |
Stored: 61085, 61135, 61326, 63738, 90203/59/77, 90349/93, 90432/54/76, 90501/16/28, 90629, 92190. |
SLS/196601 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79253 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5196 |
|
|
03/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3195 |
|
|
19/06/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63195 |
|
|
12/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90516 |
|
|
21/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Toton (16A) |
|
|
18/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Woodford Halse (1G) |
|
|
25/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
19/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aintree (8L) |
|
|
17/04/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Frodingham (36C) |
|
|
06/11/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Doncaster (36A) |
|
|
21/11/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90516 |
|
|
06/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Garnham, Harris and Elton: Chesterfield |
|
|