|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
28/02/1951 | Western Region WD\'s | So far as our records show, the number of 8F/2-8-0/WD working on the Western Region has been reduced to 30, as follow: 90148 (83D), 77184 (86A), 77200 (82B), 77203 (85B), 90188 (87K), 90201 (86E), 77247 (82B), 90214 (84K), 90225 (87K), 77326 (82B), 77368 (86A), 77380 (86G), 77408 (85A), 70801 (82C), 70808 (87F), 77288 (86E), 77289 (82B), 90524 (85C), 90529 (81F), 77099 (86G), 77102 (86A), 90572 (84K), 77116 (82B), 90579 (87K), 90630 (82D), 90685 (84E), 79225 (84K), 79232 (85A), 90701 (82D), 90716 (86E). | SLS/195104 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
01/1945 | To Service | To service as WD Number 79261 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5204 |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - St Philips Marsh (SPM) | ||
22/02/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90701 | ||
03/12/1949 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (WES) | ||
28/02/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to St Blazey (83E) | ||
31/03/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Taunton (83B) | ||
16/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
30/06/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Ebbw Junction (Newport) (86A) | ||
11/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
31/08/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
31/10/1951 | Allocation | Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C) | ||
21/02/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Neath (Court Sart) (87A) | ||
18/04/1953 | Allocation | Reallocated to Shrewsbury (84G) | ||
25/01/1958 | Allocation | Reallocated to Pontypool Road (86G) | ||
18/07/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westhouses (18B) | ||
19/09/1959 | Allocation | Reallocated to Woodford Halse (2F) | ||
01/12/1962 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90701 | ||
06/1963 | Scrapped | Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |