Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 2600 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16006 Week
» 69022 Month
» 188549 Year
» 3215402 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79263 |
m/e |
02/1945 |
British Railways |
90703 |
m/e |
06/1949 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5206 |
To Service |
During 02/1945 |
Withdrawal |
w/e Sun 11/07/1965 |
Service Life |
20 yrs, 5 mths , 10 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
02/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79263 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5206 |
|
|
03/07/1947 |
Allocation |
Loaned to To Eastern Region (91E) |
|
|
04/09/1948 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (CLK) |
|
|
06/1949 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90703 |
|
|
07/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to New England (34E) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
11/07/1965 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90703 |
|
|
04/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cox and Danks: Wadsley Bridge |
|
|