|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
31/10/1949 | Cowlairs Works | Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. | SLS/194912 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
02/1945 | To Service | To service as WD Number 79265 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5208 |
||
11/1949 | Renumbered | Renumbered to 90705 | ||
22/12/1956 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
16/01/1960 | Allocation | Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) | ||
16/06/1962 | Allocation | Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) | ||
05/10/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) | ||
28/12/1963 | Allocation | Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) | ||
23/07/1964 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 90705 | ||
10/1964 | Scrapped | Broken up by Arnott Young: Old Kilpatrick |