Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 780 Today
» 1081 Yesterday
» 2895 Week
» 25401 Month
» 328591 Year
» 1550156 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
War Dept. 79265 m/e 02/1945
British Railways 90705 m/e 11/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class WD/8
Company History WD
Wheels 2-8-0
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number 2313
Works Number 5208
To Service During 02/1945
Withdrawal w/e Thu 23/07/1964
Scrapping During 10/1964 at Arnott Young (Old Kilpatrick)
Service Life 19 yrs, 5 mths , 22 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 02/1945
62A Thornton Junction 8w/e 22/12/1956
66A Polmadie 4w/e 16/01/1960
66B Motherwell 4w/e 16/06/1962
61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 4w/e 05/10/1963
62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn w/e 23/07/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
LOAN DFU Dunfermline Upper on 24/09/1947
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 4w/e 01/12/1956
ALLOC 66B Motherwell 4w/e 09/06/1962
ALLOC 61B Aberdeen Ferryhill 5w/e 12/10/1963
ALLOC 62A Thornton Junction 5w/e 11/01/1964
WDN   w/e 23/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
31/10/1949 Cowlairs Works Locomotives entering Works during October: These included Nos. 61219, 61779/81, 61855, 1900, 62432/78, 2484, 3071, 3134/47/75/84, 4565, 64578, 4639, 4711/92, 4816, 64849, 4927, 65929/31, 7484/95, 8332/48, 68456, 69130, 9165, 69199, 9216, 69514, 9562, 77119, 79265. SLS/194912

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
02/1945 To Service To service as WD Number 79265
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5208
   
11/1949 Renumbered Renumbered to 90705    
22/12/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
16/01/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Polmadie (66A)    
16/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Motherwell (66B)    
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A)    
23/07/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 90705    

prev prev