Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 11 Online
» 1026 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18829 Week
» 71845 Month
» 191372 Year
» 3218225 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
War Dept. |
79285 |
m/e |
03/1945 |
London and North Eastern Railway (1946) |
3196 |
m/e |
02/1947 |
British Railways (1st BR) |
63196 |
w/e |
18/09/1948 |
British Railways |
90517 |
m/e |
10/1950 |
Locomotive Specifics
Class |
WD/8 |
Company History |
WD |
Wheels |
2-8-0 |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
2313 |
Works Number |
5228 |
To Service |
During 03/1945 |
Withdrawal |
Sun 15/05/1966 |
Service Life |
21 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Mentions ...
Report Date |
Title |
Report |
Source |
31/12/1946 |
General |
The following Austerity Engines taken into N.E. Area stock on 28/12/46 and now classified O7:- Allocated: Newport: 70800/24/37/47/72, 77276/90, 77357, 77506, 78520/34/70, 78633/56/62/74/87/90, 78718, 79285. Heaton: 70815, 77146, 77298, 78577, 78646/53. Springhead: 70804, 77002, 77110, 77211/54, 77474, 78540. York: 77316, 77486, 78680/91/6/8/9, 79185, 79240/88 |
SLS/194704 |
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/1945 |
To Service |
To service as WD Number 79285 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 5228 |
|
|
02/1947 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 3196 |
|
|
18/09/1948 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 63196 |
|
|
10/1950 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 90517 |
|
|
24/07/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
16/06/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newport (Teeside) (51B) |
|
|
14/06/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
01/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/05/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 90517 |
|
|
08/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|