Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 263 Today
» 1267 Yesterday
» 263 Week
» 34838 Month
» 104317 Year
» 1325882 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
GWR 9798 m/e 09/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 57xx
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0PT
Builder Swindon Works
To Service During 09/1936
Withdrawal During 10/1964
Scrapping During 12/1964 at Cohens (Morriston)
Service Life 28 yrs , 30 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
84A Stafford Road 2w/e 12/07/1952
84E Tyseley 4w/e 29/11/1952
85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/01/1963
88C Barry 4w/e 28/12/1963
   Withdrawn m/e 10/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 12/07/1952
ALLOC ME   4w/e 29/11/1952
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 12/01/1963
TOSTORE   5w/e 31/08/1963
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 31/12/1963
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 3w/e 14/09/1964
WDN   3w/e 05/10/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
09/1936 To Service To service as GWR Number 9798
Built at Swindon Works
   
12/07/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
29/11/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Tyseley (84E)    
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
28/12/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
10/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 9798    
12/1964 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Morriston    

prev prev