Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 201 Today
» 866 Yesterday
» 1946 Week
» 10688 Month
» 354867 Year
» 865969 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D99 03/05/1961
TOPS (Tops) 45135 28/09/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
3RD CARABINIER 12/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 45
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder Crewe Works
To Service 03/05/1961
Withdrawn 09/03/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 10 mths , 6 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) 03/05/1961
ML Line Power Controller, Derby 16/01/1965
D16 Nottingham Division w/e 27/01/1968
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 18/05/1968
D16 Nottingham Division 17/06/1968
   Withdrawn 09/03/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Modification

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
25/02/1961 Sightings Derby Works visit.: Around the works. - Diesel repair shop.   Link
03/05/1961 To Service To service as D99
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
08/06/1962 Sightings Derby Works visit: Around the works - Diesel Erecting shop. SLS 7/1962 Link
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
12/1965 Naming Named '3RD CARABINIER'    
27/01/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
06/02/1972 Sightings Toton depot visit during coal strike: On shed RO 4/1972 Link
09/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 45135    
09/03/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 45135    

prev prev