Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 1041 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 8501 Week
» 6014 Month
» 233898 Year
» 1455463 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
  3 31/10/1937  
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15203 05/1950  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built D3/12
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
To Service 31/10/1937
Withdrawn 29/11/1964
Time in Service 27 yrs , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1966
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
NORW Norwood Junction 01/01/1948 (Snapshot)
91W To Western Region / GWR
(Used to shunt Acton yard)
4w/e 30/04/1951
75C Norwood Junction 8w/e 20/07/1953
   Withdrawn 29/11/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN   w/e 29/11/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
31/10/1937 To Service To service as 3
Built at Ashford Works
   
05/1950 Renumbered Renumbered to 15203    
30/04/1951 Allocation Reallocated to To Western Region / GWR (91W)    
20/07/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C)    
29/11/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 15203    
01/04/1966 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev