Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 624 Today
» 854 Yesterday
» 3310 Week
» 4200 Month
» 312181 Year
» 1196562 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15211 02/04/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
Cost when Built £
To Service 02/04/1949
Withdrawn 31/12/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 8 mths , 29 dys
Cut Up 01/11/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
   Withdrawn 31/12/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
30/04/1949 To Service To service as 15211
Built at Ashford Works
   
16/07/1954 15/08/1954 Sightings Brighton Works Arrivals: Period under review. RO 9/1954 Link
26/11/1961 Sightings Eastleigh Works visit: Around the Works - Works yard. SLS 1/1962 Link
31/12/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15211    
01/11/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev