Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 4 Today
» 875 Yesterday
» 5348 Week
» 6238 Month
» 314219 Year
» 1198600 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 15214 07/05/1949

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 12
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Ashford Works
Order Number 3413
Cost when Built £
To Service 07/05/1949
Withdrawn 10/1971
Time in Service 22 yrs, 4 mths , 23 dys
Cut Up 05/1972
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
NORW Norwood Junction (New) w/e 07/05/1949
71A Eastleigh 5w/e 26/11/1959
73C Hither Green 4w/e 05/03/1962
73F Ashford Chart Leacon 2w/e 25/02/1971
   Withdrawn 10/1971


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/1949 To Service To service as 15214
Built at Ashford Works
Allocated to Norwood Junction (NORW)
   
26/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A)    
05/03/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
25/02/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F)    
10/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 15214    
05/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev