Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 3000 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16406 Week
» 69422 Month
» 188949 Year
» 3215802 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15219 |
09/07/1949 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
12 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Ashford Works |
Order Number |
3413 |
To Service |
09/07/1949 |
Withdrawn |
31/10/1971 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 3 mths , 22 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1972 |
Cut At |
Cashmore's (Newport) |
Status |
Scrapped |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/07/1949 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Eastleigh Works |
28/04/1960 |
n/a |
28/04/1960 |
11/06/1960 |
Heavy Intermediate |
|
|
|
45 days |
|
140,074 |
Mileage since last General |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/07/1949 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15219 Built at Ashford Works |
|
|
19/03/1952 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
08/02/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
28/04/1960 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Eastleigh Works (Heavy Intermediate) - Arr: 28/04/1960. Dep: 11/06/1960. Stopped on 28/04/1960 |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
31/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15219 |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|