Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1860 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19663 Week
» 72679 Month
» 192206 Year
» 3219059 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15229 |
28/07/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/07/1951 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/07/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15229 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
24/02/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (74A) |
|
|
25/10/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
06/05/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
19/08/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
31/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15229 |
|
|
05/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|