Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 544 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18347 Week
» 71363 Month
» 190890 Year
» 3217743 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
15230 |
22/09/1951 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/09/1951 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
WR ATC |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/09/1951 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 15230 Built at Ashford Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
14/02/1953 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
21/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B) |
|
|
05/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
14/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford Chart Leacon (73F) |
|
|
31/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 15230 |
|
|
11/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|