Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 215 Today
» 1073 Yesterday
» 215 Week
» 11786 Month
» 260079 Year
» 1144460 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D1674 05/04/1965
TOPS (1973) 47088 02/1974

Names Carried
Name Date From
SAMSON 09/1965

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 47
Wheels Co-Co
Builder Crewe Works
Cost when Built £
To Service 05/04/1965
Withdrawn 01/09/2003
Time in Service 38 yrs, 4 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 01/04/2007
Cut At EMR (Kingsbury)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
86A Cardiff Canton (New) 05/04/1965
82A Bristol Bath Road 5w/e 01/05/1966
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 14/06/1969
CF Cardiff Canton 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn 01/09/2003

Modifications
Date Modified Order_number Modification Total Cost
04/1976   Dual AWS Removed  
05/1976   Dual AWS Removed  


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
05/04/1965 To Service To service as D1674
Built at Crewe Works
Allocated to Cardiff Canton (86A)
   
09/1965 Naming Named 'SAMSON' at Cardiff Canton depot    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
14/06/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 47088    
04/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
05/1976 Modification Modification: Dual AWS Removed    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF)    
01/09/2003 Withdrawn Condemned as 47088    
01/04/2007 Scrapped Broken up by EMR: Kingsbury    

prev prev