Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1205 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14611 Week
» 67627 Month
» 187154 Year
» 3214007 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2049 |
24/12/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/12/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/12/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2049 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Blaydon (52C) |
|
|
08/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Percy Main (52E) |
|
|
19/06/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tweedmouth (52D) |
|
|
11/01/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
29/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
17/08/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2049 |
|
|
11/1985 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Wath Skip Hire: at NCB British Oak |
|
|