Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 3772 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17178 Week
» 70194 Month
» 189721 Year
» 3216574 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2053 |
11/04/1959 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 07/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2053 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (53A) |
|
|
13/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
07/05/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2053 from Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
10/1973 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Drapers: Hull |
|
|