Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 1010 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14416 Week
» 67432 Month
» 186959 Year
» 3213812 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2084 |
19/03/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03084 |
12/1973 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
To Service |
19/03/1959 to Ashford (73F) |
Withdrawn |
05/07/1987 |
Time in Service |
28 yrs, 3 mths , 16 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2084 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/12/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
07/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
07/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
31/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Selhurst (75C) |
|
|
27/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
12/1973 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03084 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03084 |
|
|