Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 676 Today
» 1239 Yesterday
» 7265 Week
» 12647 Month
» 50714 Year
» 50714 Total
Record: 1511 (01/12/2016)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



Reliable $1 Web Hosting by HostBig

In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2158 22/08/1960
TOPS (Tops) 03158 01/01/1973

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 22/08/1960
Withdrawn 05/07/1987
Time in Service 26 yrs, 10 mths , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) 22/08/1960
50D Goole 4w/e 09/09/1967
55F Bradford Hammerton Street 4w/e 25/05/1968
30E Colchester w/e 04/04/1970
30A Stratford w/e 08/08/1970
50C Hull Botanic Gardens w/e 06/03/1971
CR Colchester w/e 11/07/1976
   Withdrawn 05/07/1987

Modifications
Date Modified Modification
04/1968 Air Brakes fitted

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
22/08/1960 To Service To service as D2158
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
09/09/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Goole (50D)    
04/1968 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
25/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (55F)    
04/04/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (30E)    
08/08/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
06/03/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03158    
11/07/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Colchester (CR)    
05/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 03158    

prev prev