Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 118 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17921 Week
» 70937 Month
» 190464 Year
» 3217317 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11108 |
14/02/1953 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2207 |
23/10/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/02/1953 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/02/1953 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11108 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
23/10/1954 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kings Cross (34A) |
|
|
22/10/1955 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Immingham (40B) |
|
|
23/10/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2207 |
|
|
19/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colwick (40E) |
|
|
15/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to March (31B) |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
24/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Works (99C) |
|
|
16/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2207 |
|
|