Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 807 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18610 Week
» 71626 Month
» 191153 Year
» 3218006 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2385 |
24/03/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
24/03/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
24/03/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2385 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (6C) |
|
|
02/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Chester (MR) (6A) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
10/11/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
21/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stafford (5C) |
|
|
31/07/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe South (5B) |
|
|
08/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Wolverton Works () |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
27/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
17/05/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
06/12/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
31/01/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
15/02/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2385 |
|
|
08/1970 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|