Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 316 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18119 Week
» 71135 Month
» 190662 Year
» 3217515 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2389 |
26/04/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03389 |
02/02/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2389 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Gorton (9G) |
|
|
12/10/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/08/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
20/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
18/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
20/07/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
07/12/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E) |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03389 |
|
|
04/12/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
31/10/1979 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
06/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03389 |
|
|
23/07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|