Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1302 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19105 Week
» 72121 Month
» 191648 Year
» 3218501 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2393 |
03/07/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
03/07/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
03/07/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2393 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
30/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
31/12/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
31/12/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2393 |
|
|
05/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|