Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 535 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19446 Week
» 84400 Month
» 287064 Year
» 3313917 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2397 |
15/09/1961 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03397 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/09/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
03/1969 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2397 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Norwood Junction (75C) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
03/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
29/10/1971 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Derby (16C) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03397 |
|
|
02/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
05/07/1987 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03397 |
|
|
01/1991 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Vic Berry: Leicester |
|
|