Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1054 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18857 Week
» 71873 Month
» 191400 Year
» 3218253 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2423 |
09/04/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
06006 |
11/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/04/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/04/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2423 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Kittybrewster (61A) |
|
|
09/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Inverness (60A) |
|
|
03/07/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Aberdeen Ferryhill (61B) |
|
|
11/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 06006 |
|
|
06/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dundee West (DE) |
|
|
09/06/1980 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 06006 |
|
|
07/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Dundee MPD |
|
|