Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 7 Online
» 364 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18167 Week
» 71183 Month
» 190710 Year
» 3217563 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2427 |
07/12/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/12/1959 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/12/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2427 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
09/04/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
24/02/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
30/09/1969 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2427 |
|
|
10/1971 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by J McWilliams: Shettleston |
|
|