Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 4 Online
» 332 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18135 Week
» 71151 Month
» 190678 Year
» 3217531 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2430 |
25/01/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
25/01/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
25/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2430 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
16/03/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
27/04/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2430 |
|
|
01/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|