Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1569 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19372 Week
» 72388 Month
» 191915 Year
» 3218768 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2431 |
09/02/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
09/02/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
09/02/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2431 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Hamilton (West) (66C) |
|
|
04/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Motherwell (66B) |
|
|
08/04/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
26/11/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2431 from Polmadie (66A) |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: St Rollox, Glasgow |
|
|