Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 1017 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14423 Week
» 67439 Month
» 186966 Year
» 3213819 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2442 |
05/09/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2442 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
26/08/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Greenock Ladyburn (66D) |
|
|
21/10/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Corkerhill (67A) |
|
|
01/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornton Junction (62A) |
|
|
01/08/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
01/11/1972 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2442 from Dunfermline Townhill (62C) |
|
|
08/1974 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|