Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 3006 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 17049 Week
» 82003 Month
» 284667 Year
» 3311520 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11505 |
19/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2955 |
10/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
01002 |
06/1974 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/02/1956 |
|
No train brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11505 Built at Andrew Barclay, Sons & Co. Ltd., Kilmarnock Allocated to Stratford (30A) |
|
|
10/03/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2955 |
|
|
01/05/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D) |
|
|
10/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Holyhead (6J) |
|
|
06/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 01002 |
|
|
15/03/1981 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 01002 |
|
|
28/02/1982 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by O R Davies: at Holyhead Breakwater |
|
|