Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 21 Online
» 1736 Today
» 4720 Yesterday
» 25367 Week
» 90321 Month
» 292985 Year
» 3319838 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D322 |
21/04/1961 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheel Arrangement |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
21/04/1961 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
28/10/1967 |
Time in Service |
6 yrs, 6 mths , 7 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 09/1967 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Crewe, Cheshire) |
Information |
Accident damage |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
21/04/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
21/04/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
21/04/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D322 Built at Robert Stephenson & Hawthorn Ltd Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
09/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|
28/10/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 322 |
|
|