Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 23 Online
» 1013 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7403 Week
» 36901 Month
» 373747 Year
» 1595312 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D348 07/06/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 40148 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4007/06/1961
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Works Number 3094/D644
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4625
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 07/06/1961 to Neville Hill (55H)
Withdrawn 04/08/1982
Time in Service 21 yrs, 1 mth , 28 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1985
Cut At Locomotive Works (Doncaster)
Information Bogies for 40012,power unit for 40074
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
55H Neville Hill (New) on 07/06/1961
50A York (North) w/e 12/01/1963
56B Healey Mills 4w/e 03/12/1966
   Withdrawn on 04/08/1982


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
07/06/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number D348
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 3094
Allocated to Neville Hill (55H)
   
12/01/1963 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (50A)    
03/12/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B)    
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40148 (Tops)    
04/08/1982 Withdrawn Condemned as 40148    
01/07/1985 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster    

prev prev