Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 20 Online
» 1050 Today
» 1282 Yesterday
» 7440 Week
» 36938 Month
» 373784 Year
» 1595349 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D373 05/01/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 40173 03/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 40
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
4005/01/1962
Wheels 1Co-Co1
Builder English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Steam Boiler Stone OK4625
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
Other Details Central Headcode Box
To Service 05/01/1962 to Camden (1B)
Withdrawn 24/08/1981
Time in Service 19 yrs, 7 mths , 19 dys
Cut Up 01/04/1985
Cut At James A White, Jamiestown Bay (at Inverkeithing)
Information Forth Ports Authority at Inverkeithing
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
1B Camden (New) on 05/01/1962
2F Bescot w/e 03/01/1966
WL Western Lines (LMR) on 18/04/1966
9A Longsight w/e 15/06/1968
D09 Manchester Division on 17/06/1968
HA Haymarket w/e 11/05/1974
   Withdrawn on 24/08/1981


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
05/01/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D373
Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry
Allocated to Camden (1B)
   
03/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Bescot (2F)    
18/04/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL)    
15/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09)    
03/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 40173 (Tops)    
11/05/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (HA)    
24/08/1981 Withdrawn Condemned as 40173    
01/04/1985 Scrapped Broken up by James A White, Jamiestown Bay: at Inverkeithing    

prev prev