Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 3816 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17222 Week
» 70238 Month
» 189765 Year
» 3216618 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D384 |
19/03/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40184 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Central Headcode Box |
|
To Service |
19/03/1962 to Camden (1B) |
Withdrawn |
21/12/1982 |
Time in Service |
20 yrs, 9 mths , 2 dys |
Cut Up |
12/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Main generator flashover,poor bogies |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GSYP |
Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
19/03/1962 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
09/1975 |
|
Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
19/03/1962 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
09/1975 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
19/03/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D384 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Camden (1B) Livery applied: Green bodywork with small yellow warning panel |
|
|
02/10/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bletchley (1E) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40184 |
|
|
11/05/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (HA) |
|
|
09/1975 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler reinstated |
|
|
21/12/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40184 |
|
|
12/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|