Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 1036 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18839 Week
» 71855 Month
» 191382 Year
» 3218235 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D4047 |
22/12/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
08879 |
03/1974 |
|
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
02/10/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
02/10/1972 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Components
Fitted |
Component |
Details |
Removed |
Reason Removed |
22/12/1960 |
Power Unit IH4615 |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D4047 Built at Darlington Works Allocated to Sheffield Grimesthorpe (41B) |
|
|
16/09/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Sheffield Darnall (41A) |
|
|
26/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (41A) |
|
|
02/10/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 08879 |
|
|