Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 245 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 245 Week
» 30535 Month
» 333725 Year
» 1555290 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5310 06/01/1959  
TOPS (Tops) 26010 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 26
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
26/006/01/1959
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
Multiple Fitting Blue Star
To Service 06/01/1959 to Hornsey (34B)
Withdrawn 04/12/1992
Time in Service 33 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
34B Hornsey (New) on 06/01/1959
34G Finsbury Park w/e 30/04/1960
64B Haymarket w/e 28/05/1960
IS Inverness 3w/e 15/11/1975
   Stored on 05/10/1987
   Withdrawn on 04/12/1992

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
06/01/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number D5310
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hornsey (34B)
   
30/04/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (34G)    
28/05/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Haymarket (64B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 26010 (Tops)    
15/11/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Inverness (IS)    
05/10/1987 To Store To Store    
04/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26010    
04/12/1992 Withdrawn Condemned as 26010    

prev prev