Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5386 18/05/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 27103 01/01/1973  
TOPS (27/2) 27212 15/03/1975  
TOPS (27/0) 27066 05/11/1982  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 27
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
2718/05/1962
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 18/05/1962 to Cricklewood East (14A)
Withdrawn 01/07/1987
Time in Service 25 yrs, 1 mth , 13 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
14A Cricklewood East (New) on 18/05/1962
15A Leicester Midland w/e 05/10/1963
14B Cricklewood West w/e 27/06/1964
15A Leicester Midland w/e 04/07/1964
D15 Leicester Division on 16/01/1965
ML Line Power Controller, Derby w/e 07/08/1965
D16 Nottingham Division on 17/06/1968
65A Eastfield w/e 25/10/1969
   Withdrawn on 01/07/1987

ref_modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
07/1971   Dual Braked        
03/1980   ETH equipment isolated        

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
18/05/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D5386
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Cricklewood East (14A)
   
05/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
27/06/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Cricklewood West (14B)    
04/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Midland (15A)    
16/01/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Leicester Division (D15)    
07/08/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Line Power Controller, Derby (ML)    
17/06/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Nottingham Division (D16)    
25/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to Eastfield (65A)    
07/1971 Modified Modification: Dual Braked    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 27103 (Tops)    
15/03/1975 Renumbered Renumbered to 27212 (27/2)    
05/11/1982 Renumbered Renumbered to 27066 (27/0)    
01/07/1987 Withdrawn Condemned as 27066    

prev prev