Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 22 Online
» 1 Today
» 1102 Yesterday
» 6701 Week
» 29207 Month
» 332397 Year
» 1553962 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5523 19/03/1959  
TOPS (31/1) 31105 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/119/03/1959
31/102/1967
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 19/03/1959 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawn 01/05/1997
Time in Service 38 yrs, 1 mth , 12 dys
Information Disc Indicators
Status Awaiting Scrapping

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) on 19/03/1959
32B Ipswich w/e 07/11/1959
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
SF Stratford w/e 16/05/1976
TE Thornaby w/e 15/05/1988
   Withdrawn on 01/05/1997

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
02/1967   Reclassified from 30 to 31        
08/1969   Dual Braked        


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
19/03/1959 To Service To service as D5523
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
07/11/1959 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
02/1967 Modification Modification: Reclassified from 30 to 31    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
08/1969 Modification Modification: Air Brakes fitted    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31105    
16/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
15/05/1988 Allocation Reallocated to Thornaby (TE)    
01/05/1997 Withdrawn Condemned as 31105    

prev prev