Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 271 Today
» 1084 Yesterday
» 271 Week
» 30561 Month
» 333751 Year
» 1555316 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5533 04/06/1959  
TOPS (31/1) 31115 01/01/1973  
TOPS (31/4) 31466 10/03/1985  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
D13/104/06/1959
31/104/1968
31/410/03/1985
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 04/06/1959 to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Withdrawn 01/02/2001
Time in Service 41 yrs, 7 mths , 28 dys
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) on 04/06/1959
41A Tinsley w/e 09/10/1965
40B Immingham w/e 12/02/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 20/08/1966
40B Immingham w/e 15/10/1966
32A Norwich Thorpe w/e 25/03/1967
31B March w/e 11/10/1969
52A Gateshead w/e 09/10/1971
40B Immingham w/e 08/01/1972
31B March w/e 12/08/1972
FP Finsbury Park w/e 09/03/1974
YK York (North) 2w/e 09/11/1974
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 08/03/1975
YK York (North) 3w/e 02/05/1976
   Withdrawn on 01/02/2001

Modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
04/1968   Reclassified from 30 to 31        

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
04/06/1959 To Service To service as British Railways Number D5533
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
09/10/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/02/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
20/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
15/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
25/03/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)    
11/10/1969 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
09/10/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
08/01/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31115 (31/1)    
09/03/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Finsbury Park (FP)    
09/11/1974 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
02/05/1976 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
10/03/1985 Renumbered Renumbered to 31466 (31/4)    
01/02/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 31466    
01/02/2001 Withdrawn Condemned as 31466    

prev prev