Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 1073 Today
» 1272 Yesterday
» 7462 Week
» 27904 Month
» 364750 Year
» 1586315 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D5581 14/01/1960  
TOPS (31/1) 31163 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 30
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
30/214/01/1960
31/101/1966
Wheels A1A-A1A
Builder Brush Traction, Loughborough
To Service 14/01/1960 to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
Withdrawn 19/01/1999
Time in Service 39 yrs , 5 dys
Cut Up 31/03/2000
Information 4-digit route indicators
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
32A Norwich Thorpe (New) on 14/01/1960
32B Ipswich w/e 18/02/1961
30A Stratford w/e 24/02/1962
31B March w/e 23/06/1962
41A Tinsley w/e 22/01/1966
32B Ipswich w/e 12/08/1967
31B March w/e 11/05/1968
40B Immingham w/e 12/08/1972
41A Tinsley w/e 28/10/1972
YK York (North) 4w/e 06/10/1973
HO Holbeck (MR) w/e 12/01/1974
YK York (North) w/e 08/03/1975
OC Old Oak Common 3w/e 09/10/1976
   Withdrawn on 19/01/1999

ref_modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
07/1968   Dual Braked        

Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
10/02/1962 Not severe   Brake block sparks Oil impregnated dirt or waste    

Preservation
Current Status Operational
Link www.chinnorrailway.co.uk/


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
14/01/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number D5581
Built at Brush Traction, Loughborough
Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A)
   
18/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
10/02/1962 Fire Caught fire - Brake block sparks    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (30A)    
23/06/1962 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
22/01/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
12/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Ipswich (32B)    
11/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to March (31B)    
07/1968 Modified Modification: Dual Braked    
12/08/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Immingham (40B)    
28/10/1972 Allocation Reallocated to Tinsley (41A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 31163 (31/1)    
06/10/1973 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
12/01/1974 Allocation Reallocated to Holbeck (MR) (HO)    
08/03/1975 Allocation Reallocated to York (North) (YK)    
09/10/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (OC)    
19/01/1999 Withdrawn Condemned as 31163    
31/03/2000 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev