Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 30 Online
» 3480 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16886 Week
» 69902 Month
» 189429 Year
» 3216282 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
TOPS (Tops) |
56045 |
01/06/1978 |
|
TOPS (Prv) |
56301 |
27/03/2006 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
56 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
Co-Co |
Builder |
Doncaster Works |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Air Brakes fitted | Multiple Fitting | Red Diamond | Other Details | Small horn grilles Lipped buffer beam Inset marker lights |
|
To Service |
01/06/1978 to Toton (TO) |
Withdrawn |
04/2009 |
Time in Service |
30 yrs, 9 mths , 30 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/06/1978 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 56045 Built at Doncaster Works |
|
|
29/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
29/12/1980 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Tinsley (TI) |
|
|
04/10/1987 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (CF) |
|
|
27/03/2006 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 56301 |
|
|
04/2009 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 56301 |
|
|