Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 6 Online
» 225 Today
» 1253 Yesterday
» 7685 Week
» 5198 Month
» 233082 Year
» 1454647 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6321 07/04/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 22
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L97
Works Number 27894
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
Multiple Fitting White Diamond
To Service 07/04/1960
Withdrawn 03/08/1968 off Bristol Bath Road (82A)
Time in Service 8 yrs, 3 mths , 27 dys
Cut Up 06/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 07/04/1960
83A Newton Abbot 5w/e 01/05/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road m/e 30/06/1967
   Withdrawn 03/08/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 83A Newton Abbot 5w/e 01/05/1966
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road 9w/e 22/07/1967
TOSTORE 85A Worcester 8w/e 27/07/1968
WDN   03/08/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
07/04/1960 To Service To service as D6321
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27894
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
30/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
03/08/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D6321    
06/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev