Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 21 Online
» 534 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6741 Week
» 4254 Month
» 232138 Year
» 1453703 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6324 01/06/1960  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 22
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L97
Works Number 27897
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
Multiple Fitting White Diamond
To Service 01/06/1960
Withdrawn 14/09/1968 off Bristol Bath Road (82A)
Time in Service 8 yrs, 3 mths , 13 dys
Cut Up 05/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 01/06/1960
82A Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 15/01/1967
   Withdrawn 14/09/1968

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 82A Bristol Bath Road N 15/01/1967
WDN   14/09/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
Fires
Date of Fire Severity Damage Source of Fire Material Details Location
25/04/1964 Not severe   Electrical overloads or arcs Electrical insulation    


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
01/06/1960 To Service To service as D6324
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27897
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
15/01/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
14/09/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D6324    
05/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev