Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 737 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18540 Week
» 71556 Month
» 191083 Year
» 3217936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6329 |
18/06/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
18/06/1960 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
18/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
04/11/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
18/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6329 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27902 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/01/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
15/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A) |
|
|
30/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
30/11/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6329 from Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|