Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D6335 |
22/02/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
22/02/1961 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/02/1961 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
WR ATC |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
16/07/1962 |
Not severe |
|
Hot engine parts, including exhaust blows |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/02/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D6335 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27908 Allocated to Laira (83D) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
15/07/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A) |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
14/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 6335 from Old Oak Common (81A) |
|
|
05/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport |
|
|