Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 568 Today
» 852 Yesterday
» 6377 Week
» 13561 Month
» 321542 Year
» 1205923 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6341 12/05/1962

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 22
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L97
Works Number 27914
Cost when Built £
To Service 12/05/1962
Withdrawn 30/11/1968 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Time in Service 6 yrs, 6 mths , 18 dys
Cut Up 05/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 12/05/1962
83A Newton Abbot 4w/e 13/06/1965
81A Old Oak Common 5w/e 01/05/1966
82A Bristol Bath Road 2w/e 31/05/1967
   Stored 2w/e 31/05/1967
82A Bristol Bath Road (Reinstated) m/e 30/06/1967
81A Old Oak Common 4w/e 31/08/1967
   Withdrawn 30/11/1968


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
12/05/1962 To Service To service as D6341
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27914
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
13/06/1965 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Abbot (83A)    
01/05/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
31/05/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
31/05/1967 To Store To Store    
30/06/1967 Reinstated Reinstated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
31/08/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
30/11/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as D6341    
05/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    

prev prev