Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 7 Online
» 192 Today
» 1293 Yesterday
» 6399 Week
» 3912 Month
» 231796 Year
» 1453361 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6351 27/06/1962  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 22
Wheels B-B
Builder North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow
Order Number L97
Works Number 27924
Fittings (as built)
Train Brakes Vacuum Brakes fitted
AWS Western Region AWS fitted
Multiple Fitting White Diamond
To Service 27/06/1962
Withdrawn 30/11/1969 off Old Oak Common (81A)
Time in Service 7 yrs, 5 mths , 3 dys
Cut Up 05/1969
Cut At Cashmore's (Newport)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
83D Laira (New) 27/06/1962
82A Bristol Bath Road 4w/e 06/10/1962
81A Old Oak Common 6w/e 12/10/1964
   Withdrawn m/e 01/1969
   Withdrawn 30/11/1969

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 81A Old Oak Common 3w/e 14/09/1964
TOSTORE   5w/e 23/11/1968
WDN 81A Old Oak Common w/e 30/11/1968

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
27/06/1962 To Service To service as D6351
Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 27924
Allocated to Laira (83D)
   
06/10/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Bristol Bath Road (82A)    
12/10/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Old Oak Common (81A)    
29/11/1964 Sightings Swindon Works visit: In 'A' shop RO 1/1965 Link
01/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D6351    
05/1969 Scrapped Broken up by Cashmore's: Newport    
30/11/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as D6351    

prev prev