Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 1 Online
» 164 Today
» 1348 Yesterday
» 164 Week
» 39210 Month
» 413223 Year
» 1634788 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6586 02/02/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 33201 01/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
33/202/02/1962
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 02/02/1962 to Hither Green (73C)
Withdrawn 01/10/1993
Time in Service 31 yrs, 7 mths , 29 dys
Status Preserved

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 02/02/1962
73D St Leonards 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green w/e 20/10/1967
   Withdrawn on 01/10/1993

ref_modifications
Date Modified Order Number Modification Status Charged to Capital Charged to Revenue Total Cost
09/1971   Slow Speed Control fitted        

Preservation
Current Status Unknown


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
02/02/1962 To Service To service as British Railways Number D6586
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (73D)    
20/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
09/1971 Modified Modification: Slow Speed Control fitted    
01/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33201 (Tops)    
01/10/1993 Withdrawn Condemned as 33201    

prev prev