Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 62 Today
» 1091 Yesterday
» 7516 Week
» 10098 Month
» 274731 Year
» 1496296 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D6592 16/03/1962  
TOPS (Tops) 33207 02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 33
Wheels Bo-Bo
Builder Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
To Service 16/03/1962 to Hither Green (73C)
Status In Service

Allocations
Code Name Date From
73C Hither Green (New) on 16/03/1962
73D St Leonards 4w/e 22/07/1963
73C Hither Green w/e 20/10/1967


Summary
Start End Event Details Source See Also
16/03/1962 To Service To service as D6592
Built at Birmingham Railway Carriage & Wagon Company
Allocated to Hither Green (73C)
   
22/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to St Leonards (73D)    
20/10/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Hither Green (73C)    
27/10/1968 Sightings Hither Green depot: On shed RO 12/1968 Link
02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 33207    

prev prev